Trustees THE CHILTERN SOCIETY
Charity number: 1085163
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Kearey | Chair | 19 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||
Peter Phippen | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
James Russell Wheatcroft | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Grahame David Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Robin Bolam Storey | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Mark Gardiner | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Brian McGowan | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
William Richard Lacey | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jane Elizabeth Herve | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Mona Smith | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Helen Veronica Griffiths | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Luke Jefferys | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Catherine Rebecca Moncrieff | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JOHN LEIGHTON GLADWIN | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.