MIAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1084848
Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principle activity of the charity is that of rental income received from the property owned by the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022

Total income: £3,000
Total expenditure: £2,928

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2001: Standard registration
  • 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 06 March 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fizul Rahman Khan Trustee 21 February 2020
None on record
Dawood Saleem Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
NADIM MIR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £112.57k £109.86k £103.50k £33.54k £3.00k
Total expenditure £69.00k £186.89k £68.94k £12.36k £2.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 07 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Quantum Offices office 33
202 High Road
ILFORD
Essex
IG1 1QB
Phone:
02085537777
Website:

No information available