HAMPSHIRE PCT CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The funds are held for any charitable purpose relating to the National Health Service wholly or mainly for the Hampshire Primary Care Trust. The Charity is funded by donations and/or legacies received from patients, their relatives, the general public amd other organisations. The Charity operates mainly within the area of Hampshire but also covers the Surrey and Hampshire borders area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 May 2008: Standard registration
- 28 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NORTH HAMPSHIRE PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £492.89k | £377.96k | £1.11m | £273.71k | £104.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £498.60k | £352.34k | £234.33k | £1.26m | £339.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.08m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £23.77k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £108.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £177.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £18.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £570 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.55k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 31 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED FEB 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- HAMPSHIRE PCT GUILDFORD CLINICAL SERVICES
- HAMPSHIRE PCT HAMPSHIRE CLINICAL SERVICES
- HAMPSHIRE PCT MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES
- HAMPSHIRE PCT SPECIALIST SERVICES
- HAMPSHIRE PCT SURREY HEATH CLINICAL SERVICES
- HAMPSHIRE PCT WAVERLEY CLINICAL SERVICES
- THE SURREY HAMPSHIRE BORDERS NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- 12 May 2008 : Standard registration
- 28 March 2013 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window