THE FOSTERING FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance in the training and support of social workers who in turn are supporting foster carers and children placed by Local Authoritites in foster care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2001: Standard registration
- 01 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 19 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 February 2016 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 AUGUST 2001.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF INFANTS, CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS WHO ARE ACCOMMODATED AND CARED FOR BY FOSTER CARERS, BY THE PROMOTION OF THE HIGHEST STANDARDS AND QUALITY OF SERVICES TO THOSE INFANTS, CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS. 2. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE NEEDS OF, AND REQUIREMENTS FOR, FOSTER CARERS AND THOSE EMPLOYED IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE PROVISION OF FOSTERING SERVICES, AND THE WAY IN WHICH THOSE NEEDS AND REQUIREMENTS CAN BETTER BE MET.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window