Accounts and annual returns THE JADE CROSSING FUND

Charity number: 1087231
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 01 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 01 March 2013 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 23 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required