Trustees THE ABDO COLLEGE OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1087337
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daryl Newsome Trustee 08 February 2025
None on record
BRENDA AlEXIS RENNIE Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Kevin Gutsell FBDO Trustee 06 May 2022
None on record
Helen Wilkinson FBDO Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Claire Louise Walsh FBDO Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Leslie Thomas Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
Saima Begum Trustee 06 October 2018
None on record