Accounts and annual returns ALGERIAN BRITISH CONNECTION (ABC)

Charity number: 1091410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 April 2025 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 April 2025 439 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 May 2023 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 May 2023 466 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 May 2023 831 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required