Financial history ALGERIAN BRITISH CONNECTION (ABC)

Charity number: 1091410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.29k £1.72k £2.27k £215 £415
Total expenditure £9.10k £3.72k £0 £700 £442
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A