THE FRIENDS OF MARK CROSS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1085550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the charity is to advance the education of the pupils in the school in particular by developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school and by engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 15 October 2024

Total income: £4,739
Total expenditure: £3,024

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FMCS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leanne Dullage Trustee 09 September 2023
None on record
Alma Scales Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/10/2020 15/10/2021 15/10/2022 15/10/2023 15/10/2024
Total gross income £4.94k £3.09k £3.20k £3.05k £4.74k
Total expenditure £7.04k £2.06k £6.70k £5.63k £3.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2022 17 November 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2020 09 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Friends Mark Cross Primary School
Mark Cross C Of E School
Mark Cross
CROWBOROUGH
East Sussex
TN6 3PJ
Phone:
01892315451
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available