NICRO UK TRUST FOR A SAFER SOUTH AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises money in the UK to support the work in South Africa of NICRO - The National Institute for Crime Prevention and Re-Integration of Offenders. It primarily supports one specific scheme run by NICRO, namely, their youth diversion programmes of activities designed to help young people avoid being sent to prison when first appearing in court.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 29 November 2001: Standard registration
- 12 February 2010: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- NICRO UK TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.55k | £24.01k | £21.80k | £6.15k | £11.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £5.81k | £17.68k | £1.66k | £28.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 February 2009 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 27 February 2009 | 27 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 15 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 17 February 2006 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 17 February 2006 | 17 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH DECEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME; 2. TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM, AND THE PREVENTION OF, CRIMINAL ACTS, IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING THE POLICE AND OTHER BODIES IN MEASURES DESIGNED TO REDUCE THE LEVEL OF CRIME; 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE SAME AS A RESULT OF A CRIMINAL OFFENCE AND AMONG THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED; 4. TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING, HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE IN DANGER OF SUFFERING A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY; 5. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, IN MATTERS RELATED TO CRIME; AND 6. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window