REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") TESTIMONY PARISH BIRMINGHAM CITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Setting-up of churches in all nations where each person can develop a thriving relationship with God by increasing their knowledge of Him and of His plans for their future ??? both here on earth and in the afterlife 2. Encourage love among members and encourage them to be good citizens of their community 3. Help members in need financially and morally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 15 February 2001: Standard registration
- RCGG (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAWRENCE OLATUYI | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY AKINRINDE | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oladipupo Adekoya | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADENIYI OLOYEDE | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADEWALE ADESANYA | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.27k | £69.99k | £63.58k | £70.34k | £84.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.71k | £61.78k | £56.15k | £62.06k | £63.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £647 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 WESTLEY STREET
DUDLEY
DY1 1TS
- Phone:
- 07944781001
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window