NORWICH CITY COMMUNITY SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Sports Foundation is Norwich City FC's official charity We use the power of sport to support and inspire our community. Our charitable objectives are driving inclusion for people with disabilities, boosting mental health and wellbeing, and supporting disadvantaged people to raise their aspirations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£6,065,591
Donations and legacies | £1.42m | |
Charitable activities | £4.45m | |
Other trading activities | £200.89k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,865,358
Raising funds | £559.09k | |
Charitable activities | £4.11m | |
Other | £1.20m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £138,593 from 2 government contract(s) and £96,344 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.76m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.11m | |
Retained for future use | £200.23k |
People

107 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
83 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Peterborough City
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 August 2001: Standard registration
- 13 January 2023: Funds received from 1148522 NORWICH CITY POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL CLUB
- NORWICH CITY FC FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- NORWICH CITY FC/NORWICH COUNTY FA FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- NORWICH CITY FOOTBALL CLUB/NORFOLK COUNTY FA FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY. (Previous name)
- NORWICH CITY FOOTBALL CLUB/NORWICH COUNTY FA FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAKE HUMPHREY | Chair | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Simon George | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Webber | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ronald Kerr | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eugenie Margaret Barham | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Smith | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN DRAKE | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.84m | £3.89m | £4.59m | £5.69m | £6.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.83m | £4.10m | £4.31m | £5.23m | £5.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £138.59k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £244.92k | £136.68k | N/A | £96.34k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £521.75k | £435.99k | £713.35k | £1.08m | £1.42m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £187.66k | £364.81k | £344.10k | £117.60k | £200.89k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.13m | £3.08m | £3.53m | £4.49m | £4.45m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.85m | £3.32m | £3.29m | £3.69m | £4.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £539.79k | £417.46k | £279.71k | £567.29k | £559.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £436.52k | £364.79k | £739.36k | £978.57k | £1.20m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.27m | £5.24m | £5.99m | £5.84m | £6.90m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.75m | £2.96m | £3.24m | £3.37m | £3.11m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.02m | £6.40m | £7.16m | £6.69m | £7.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1/11/2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/01/2001, 4/10/2001; BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 9/8/ 2010 & BY CERT OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/9/2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/03/2015 as amended on 15 Mar 2018 as amended on 26 Sep 2019 as amended on 26 Sep 2019 as amended on 22 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE, WITHOUT REFERENCE TO RACE, SEX, CREED OR SOCIAL BACKGROUND, FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, STUDENTS AND ADULTS IN NORFOLK AND OTHER COUNTIES IN EAST ANGLIA: 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) OF SUCH PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3.2 TO ENCOURAGE SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE GAME OF FOOTBALL, OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND TRUSTEES OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED."; 3.3 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.4 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY SPORTS FOUNDATION
NORWICH CITY FC
CARROW ROAD
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR1 1JE
- Phone:
- 01603761122
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window