HJB CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2001: Standard registration
- 30 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15k | £252 | £184 | £145 | £79 | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.42k | £14.50k | £4.68k | £6.87k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 02 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 23 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 07 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 4 DECEMBER, 2000 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED MADE 20 MARCH, 2001.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY: 1.AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE TO ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES OR TO INDIVIDUALS IN FULL TIME EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE RESEARCH OR OTHERWISE PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; 2.AWARDING TO SUCH INDIVIDUALS GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION; 3.MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING CHARITABLE STATUS OR OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES WHICH PROMOTE EDUCATION GENERALLY; 4.PROMOTING RESEARCH AND STUDY OF NATURAL HISTORY PARTICULARLY MYCOLOGY AND LICHENOLOGY AND CONSERVATION OF BOTH FLORA AND FAUNA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window