THE FRIENDS OF ST ANNE'S CHURCH, KEW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for the repair and maintenance of St Anne's Church, Kew, we have organised concerts, lectures and other events. We have contributed money for the repair of the flood-prone forecourt, and to restore the church's dilapidated South Porch. We have paid for new floodlighting to enhance the appearance of the church and its security and to restore several important tombs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 05 March 2001: Standard registration
- F STACQ (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ST ANNE'S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Merrylees | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynn Tandler | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Efland Bradshaw | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Giles Anthony Fraser | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
John Henry Mortley | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
SIMON MOLLETT | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA PATRICIA PETHICK | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MARGARET BOOTH | Trustee | 14 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Harrison Jones | Trustee | 17 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.78k | £11.82k | £15.92k | £13.84k | £12.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.61k | £29.48k | £3.09k | £2.05k | £13.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO AID IN THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF ST ANNE'S CHURCH AND ITS CHURCHYARD IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS THEREIN.
Area of benefit
KEW
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 RIVERVIEW ROAD
LONDON
W4 3QH
- Phone:
- 02087478272
- Email:
- stannekew@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window