THE ARBORFIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the efficiency of the Army by maintaining contact between former apprentices of the Schools and Colleges and their REME Junior Soldier successors. The Association actively seeks to provide for the welfare of former apprentices of the Schools and Colleges and their dependants who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 2001: Standard registration
- THE ARBORFIELD OLD BOYS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Michael James Tizard | Chair | 16 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Garry Wright-Rivers | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Chevalier Canning | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Horace Jobes | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert David McKeegan-Brown | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Garry Dickson | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Leslie | Trustee | 16 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £17.53k | £20.34k | £41.21k | £15.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.70k | £12.12k | £15.06k | £21.41k | £24.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 JULY 2004 AND 31 JULY 2010. as amended on 08 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY BY (A) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN FORMER APPRENTICES OF THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES AND THEIR REME JUNIOR SOLDIER SUCCESSORS, FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING FOR SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM; (B) FOSTERING ESPIRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND PRESERVING THE TRADITIONS OF THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES. AND (B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF THE COLLEGE AND PRESERVING THE TRADITIONS OF THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES. 2. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE, THE ASSOCIATION OR FORMER APPRENTICES OF THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES). 3. TO COMMEMORATE AND REMEMBER MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE FORMER APPRENTICES OF THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES AND THEIR REME JUNIOR SOLDIER SUCCESSORS WHO HAVE LOST THEIR LIVES OR SUFFERED INJURY, OR PUT THEMSELVES AT RISK OF LOSS OF LIFE OR INJURY, IN SERVICE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT SPECIFIED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Pentreath Close
FOWEY
Cornwall
PL23 1EP
- Phone:
- 07813041602
- Email:
- nigeyc@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window