THE TAVISTOCK PHYSICALLY CHALLENGED GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tavistock Physically Challenged:- We enable people with disabilities to access opportunities for social interaction and support. There are about 30 members and 10 volunteers and we all meet twice a month, either for luncg or after-noon tea all over Devon and Cornwall, or we have speakers,games and musical after-noons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 30 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY BROCK | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE JAMES | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04k | £65 | £192 | £380 | £520 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £426 | £1.02k | £2.37k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 July 2022 | 499 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF TAVISTOCK AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
TAVISTOCK AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Friars Walk
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 9PT
- Phone:
- 01822612215
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window