CHELMSFORD COUNSELLING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chelmsford Counselling foundation provides affordable counselling to members of the community and trains counsellors to BACP accredited standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 31 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dimitra Theodoropoulou | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jagjeet Panesar | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Travis | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arvinder Paul Singh Mudhar | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.63k | £330.42k | £336.18k | £290.04k | £252.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.77k | £328.46k | £298.27k | £293.58k | £281.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £726 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24TH JANUARY 2001 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23RD JULY 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS 2) TO CONDUCT STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO METHODS OF TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH 3) TO TRAIN PERSONS IN COUNSELLING SO THAT THEY MAY TREAT PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 CEDAR AVENUE
CHELMSFORD
CM1 2QH
- Phone:
- 01245284890
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window