THE ROUND TABLE MILLENNIUM TRUST (RTCW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support by making donations of capital and income to Children's Wish (Round Table) Limited and any other charity or charities registered in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK NEWBY | Chair |
|
||||||
TONY BOOTH | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEAL SPENCER CHAVE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAMIAN PATRICK SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 April 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 July 2023 | 480 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 July 2023 | 845 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 19 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT, BY MAKING DONATIONS OF CAPITAL AND INCOME: CHILDREN'S WISH (ROUND TABLE) LIMITED, REGISTERED CHARITY 1060225 ANY OTHER CHARITY OR CHARITIES REGISTERED OR RECOGNISED AS SUCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARCHESI HOUSE
4 EMBASSY DRIVE
CALTHORPE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1TP
- Phone:
- 01214564402
- Email:
- hq@roundtable.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window