Financial history ASHBROOKE SPORTS CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1087978
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £512.71k £221.53k £467.76k £441.63k £385.99k
Total expenditure £512.24k £283.73k £540.93k £488.01k £473.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.99k £9.66k £41.83k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £96.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £416.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £110 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £350.43k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £161.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.13k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A