Trustees NEPACS
Charity number: 1088051
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK WEEDING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Tague | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Phelan | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise Mooney | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
REV KATE BROOKE | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ABRAHAMS | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SEACROFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES BLACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET STOCKDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sareth Ann Nainby-Luxmoore | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.