Financial history KINGSGATE CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1087562
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £131.78k £114.59k £205.64k £201.34k £154.05k
Total expenditure £103.14k £96.85k £121.60k £181.99k £136.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A