Financial history THE CALEDONIAN CLUB MEMBERS' COMMON GOOD FUND

Charity number: 1086191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.82k £4.48k £112.44k £83.34k £58.26k
Total expenditure £94.93k £6.98k £87.36k £74.68k £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A