BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION - LONDON SOUTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Teaching mother tongue Bengali language. 2. Promote cultural awareness among the ethnic. 3. Advise and educate young people. 4. Advise and educate young people about the effect of drugs. 5. Alcohol & smoking. 6. Unemployment job centre. 7. Caring for old age & disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Bangladesh
- India
Governance
- 18 September 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
UDDIN ALI HOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FAHIM MAKSUD ALI | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
IQBAL AHMED | Trustee | 07 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ENUS ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ABUTALEB MUHAMMED FAZLUR RASHID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NURUL HOQUE MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAOZIA SULTANA RASHID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
26 PICKFORD LANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57k | £2.70k | £2.30k | £2.50k | £2.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £1.70k | £900 | £750 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 February 2025 | 585 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 January 2022 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 27 NOVEMBER, 2000 AND AMENDED ON 22 AUGUST, 2001.
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHED PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF BANGLADESHI PERSONS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BEXLEY AND GREENWICH, AND DARTFORD IN KENT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY OR NEED AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BEXLEY, GREENWICH IN LONDON, AND DARTFORD IN KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 WILLOW AVENUE
SIDCUP
DA15 8NU
- Phone:
- 07958534243
- Email:
- fahim_maksud@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window