KING EDWARD VI SCHOOL SOUTHAMPTON

Charity Number: 1088030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of education and related activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oliver Robert Edwin Wylie Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Dr Michael Roland Witold Evans Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Christie Marie Lambert Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
GEORGINA LOUISE WARRINGTON Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record
GERAINT CHARLES BOYENS DAVIS Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
TOBY ANDREW MURRAY STEELE Trustee 18 August 2023
None on record
VIRGINIA CATERINA STUART-TAYLOR Trustee 11 May 2023
RALEIGH INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Charity is insolvent
DARMESH SINGH DHANDA Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
DANIEL PETER GEDDES Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
ALUN SELWYN JONES Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
ADAM OLIVER KNIBB BA. BArch Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
ANTONY JAMES CONNELL Trustee 21 April 2020
HERRIARD VILLAGE CHARITY
Received: On time
PENELOPE SARI KIRK Trustee 03 January 2019
None on record
Rev JONATHAN MARK FINCH Trustee 01 August 2018
THE SOUTHAMPTON (CITY CENTRE) RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH CITY CENTRE PARISH SOUTHAMPTON
Received: On time
HARRIET VICTORIA LANGFORD NICHOLSON Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
JULIAN JOHN GRAY FCA Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
WENDY PATRICIA SWINN Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
CARYN MUSKER Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record
IAN RUDLAND Trustee 06 July 2016
None on record
MARK CHALONER Trustee 06 July 2016
None on record
ALAN JOHN MORGAN FCAATII MA Trustee
WINCHESTER MUSICALS AND OPERA SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr ALAN LIONEL THOMAS MA PHD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £20.73m £21.66m £24.28m £26.20m £26.80m
Total expenditure £19.72m £20.53m £22.68m £24.90m £25.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £423.48k £106.94k £216.94k £133.07k £300.78k
Income - Other trading activities £355.55k £367.13k £799.45k £1.49m £849.76k
Income - Charitable activities £19.76m £20.85m £22.95m £24.18m £25.17m
Income - Endowments £315.00k £0 £50.50k £750 £159.75k
Income - Investment £142.18k £226.33k £266.89k £287.55k £476.24k
Income - Other £44.92k £49.76k £52.85k £101.24k £0
Income - Legacies £108.48k £51.00k £4.50k £24.33k £22.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.04m £20.10m £22.04m £23.20m £23.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £123.26k £104.82k £185.75k £216.89k £1.14m
Expenditure - Governance £52.65k £44.52k £50.63k £64.68k £64.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £45.19k £51.04k £60.31k £66.36k £0
Expenditure - Other £550.19k £329.13k £451.79k £1.48m £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £29.71m £29.73m £30.73m £32.08m £24.09m
Long-term investments £8.08m £9.79m £10.31m £14.22m £18.41m
Other assets £4.25m £5.03m £5.48m £1.66m £7.85m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£4.48m -£3.62m £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.21m £1.79m £2.49m £2.69m £7.56m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 21 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED 28 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT KING EDWARD VI SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OF PRIZES AND AWARDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT ACTUALLY KING EDWARD SCHOOL
Registration history
  • 06 December 2002 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
KING EDWARD VI SCHOOL
WILTON ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 5UQ
Phone:
02380799208