GILES VAN COLLE MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
T0 MAKE AWARDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMIN JAMES ARNOLD | Chair | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Esther Julia Donoff | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMONE LEAH LYONS | Trustee | 04 February 2001 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE JOY VAN COLLE | Trustee | 04 February 2001 |
|
|
||||
RABBI DR MARTIN HANS VAN DEN BERGH | Trustee | 04 February 2001 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP EMANUEL SCHAJER | Trustee | 04 February 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36 | £24 | £167 | £804 | £1.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £96 | £1.58k | £60 | £1.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN THE 22-35 YEAR AGE GROUP (2) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC RESEARCH INTO OPTOMETRIC SCIENCES INTO METHODS OF BENEFITING YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTIES ASSOCIATED WITH VISUAL FACTORS AND TO ADVANCE CLINICAL EXCELLENCE IN PROVIDING EYE CARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL LEARNING DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Tilehouse Close
Borehamwood
WD6 4AS
- Phone:
- 07973724515
- Email:
- gvcmf@kateandbenjy.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window