Accounts and annual returns DAVID GARETH JONES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1099098
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 15 February 2012 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 February 2011 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required