Accounts and annual returns ABBEY PARK MIDDLE SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1086287
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 August 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2023 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required