Financial history ABBEY PARK MIDDLE SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1086287
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.13k £1.20k £0 £2.42k £102
Total expenditure £1.72k £2.95k £2.26k £2.12k £251
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A