Financial history THE LEONARDO TRUST

Charity number: 1086045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £304.44k £317.27k £314.60k £358.74k £65.90k
Total expenditure £240.52k £317.70k £304.16k £334.65k £339.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £17.69k £19.65k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A