THE LEONARDO TRUST

Charity number: 1086045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for full time carers and those being cared for. Contributions towards care sitting services. Funding holidays for carers Assisting finance in relaxation or training courses or perhaps hobbies or activities Creative thinking towards financial assistance for carers We cannot supply care staff direct Emergency funding/grants for carers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £65,901
Total expenditure: £339,281

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Dorset
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 2001: Standard registration
  • 28 February 2019: Funds received from 1126739 ADVOCARE - CARING FOR CARERS
  • 17 August 2022: Funds received from 1047919 THE LEAGUE OF OAKLEY HOUSE AND COMMUNITY FRIENDS
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Lesley Dixon Chair 11 February 2019
LEONARDO CARER SUPPORT
Recently registered
Nicola Jayne Beckley Trustee 05 September 2023
LEONARDO CARER SUPPORT
Recently registered
Mevin Sohorye Trustee 05 September 2023
LEONARDO CARER SUPPORT
Recently registered
Simon Arthur Dewi Clifford Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Benjamin Cole Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £304.44k £317.27k £314.60k £358.74k £65.90k
Total expenditure £240.52k £317.70k £304.16k £334.65k £339.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £17.69k £19.65k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Anne van Brussel House
Unit 1, Albany Business Park
Cabot Lane
POOLE
Dorset
BH17 7BX
Phone:
01202698325