NAVRATRI GARBA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Navratri Garba now runs a Temple at 55 High Street, Cowley, Middx UB8 2DX and performs regular Havans for Mataji and Chandi Path. Other Activities include Providing music lessons to various age groups, regular religious Sunday programmes, Sunday Soup Kitchen, Yoga Classes, Navratri Festival Celebrations, Diwali Celebrations and celebrating all Hindu festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASWANT RAI MAICHA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PARESH BHAI LODHIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VINIKA MAICHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRINEAL CHANDRA MAICHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARDABEN LODHIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEAL LODHIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.80k | £81.06k | £94.52k | £139.12k | £110.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.07k | £66.93k | £53.66k | £71.85k | £54.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 July 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 July 2024 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 May 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PERFORMANCE OF NAVRATRI GARBA RELIGION CELEBRATIONS (INCLUDING HAVAN OF GODDESS DURGA AND AMBA MAA) INDIGENOUS TO GUJARITIS. (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THOSE WHO MAY BE IN NEED OF HELP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 ESTCOURT ROAD
FULHAM
LONDON
SW6 7HB
- Phone:
- 07882253540
- Email:
- jasmaicha@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window