FRIENDS OF AB KETTLEBY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Develop more extended relationships between those associated with the school. b) Engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it. c) Provide and assist in the provision of such facilities or items for education at the school as the committee in consultation with the Governing Body shall determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 27 February 2001: Standard registration
- FOAKS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashleigh Kerr | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Walton | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Michele Holden Carroll | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Lowe | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.68k | £2.37k | £11.35k | £16.80k | £13.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £5.62k | £7.39k | £18.02k | £15.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 2001 as amended on 09 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ab Kettleby Primary School
Wartnaby Road
Ab Kettleby
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE14 3JJ
- Phone:
- 01664504870
- Email:
- contactus@foaks.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window