Financial history FRIENDS OF EGGLESCLIFFE CE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1085585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £4.10k £3.70k £0 £861 £8.67k
Total expenditure £1.77k £2.29k £3.16k £752 £7.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A