PENTRA SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PSL is a well established organisation, which is key to the management and delivery of services, which benefit the welfare and employment prospects of residents across the communities of Cheshire and Merseyside and carries out the following activities: employment and skills provision, work experience, occupational training and qualifications, IAG Services and Travel Support Services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 February 2001: Standard registration
- PENTRA (Working name)
- THE PSL GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYN ROSEMARY GARWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Lewis-Santo | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Horton | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|||||
LINDA ELLEN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84k | £13.49k | £6.27k | £14.40k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.24k | £54.22k | £58.65k | £54.65k | £58.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JANUARY 2001 AND 18 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON ALL ANY OF THE BUSINESS OF AN ORGANISATION FOR THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT AND INCLUDING MORE PARTICULARLY TO ASSIST THE LONG TERM UNEMPLOYED TO FIND MEANINGFUL EMPLOYMENT BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING ,EDUCATION PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, WORK EXPERIENCE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO FACILITATE THE OVERALL ENCOURAGEMENT FOR THEM TO SEEK MEANINGFUL EMPLOYMENT AND TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO ACQUIRE REQUISITE PERSONAL AND SKILLS BASED ATTRIBUTES NECESSARY FOR THEM TO ACHIEVE MEANINGFUL EMPLOYMENT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR PERSONS WHO ARE THREATENED WITH UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING AND BY ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE CHESHIRE FLINTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit C5
Stanlaw Abbey Business Centre
Dover Drive
ELLESMERE PORT
CH65 9BF
- Phone:
- 07583239439
- Email:
- info@pentra.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window