Financial history BLACKHEATH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1087003
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.08k £3.20k £2.91k £3.55k £2.50k
Total expenditure £2.50k £2.96k £4.34k £3.50k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A