BLACKHEATH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religous activities including Bible study and proclamation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sandwell
Governance
- 13 June 2001: Standard registration
- 07 March 2023: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.08k | £3.20k | £2.91k | £3.55k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £2.96k | £4.34k | £3.50k | £2.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 2 MAY 2001.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN STATEMENT OF FAITH. 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A HALL AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window