Financial history LITTLE ACORNS NURSERY

Charity number: 1088015
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £24.47k £25.18k £30.18k £23.12k £18.27k
Total expenditure £21.26k £29.74k £23.56k £25.91k £21.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0