TREARDDUR BAY & DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a Village Hall facility for the use of locally based educational, youth and recreational organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,376 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 15 October 2003: Standard registration
- TREARDDUR BAY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dafydd Rhys Thomas | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEBBIE CARMICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL NORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.68k | £23.02k | £9.12k | £14.45k | £14.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.74k | £8.34k | £8.87k | £16.66k | £14.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | £22.59k | N/A | N/A | £2.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH MAY 1979
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY CONVEYED (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE TRUST PROPERTY) SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF HOLYHEAD RURAL IN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TREARDDUR BAY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trearddur Bay Village Hall
Lon St. Ffraid
Trearddur Bay
HOLYHEAD
Anglesey
LL65 2YR
- Phone:
- 07788974233
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window