SOCIETY OF OUR LADY OF LOURDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society Of Our Lady Of Lourdes promotes devotion to Our Lady, organises pilgrimages to Lourdes, and services in her honour, and provides financial and other assistance to enable pilgrims who could not afford the cost to go to Lourdes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 2001: Standard registration
- SOLL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam Denis Judge | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Kelly | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Chandler | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELIZABETH ROCKEY | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sacha Therese Blanchard | Trustee | 05 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Unwin | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.03k | £378.22k | £101.41k | £39.06k | £67.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.31k | £34.83k | £45.18k | £143.59k | £101.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING BY PROMOTING DEVOTION TO OUR LADY OF LOURDES BY ORGANISING PILGRIMAGES TO LOURDES AND SERVICES IN HER HONOUR BY ARRANGING FOR SERMONS AND LECTURES ON LOURDES AND AND BY ASSISTING POOR SICK PILGRIMS FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE TO GO TO LOURDES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 ST. KATHERINES ROAD
EXETER
EX4 7JJ
- Phone:
- 02088489833
- Email:
- enquiries@soll-lourdes.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window