Governing document THE FRIENDS OF POCKLINGTON ARTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1086300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEB 2001 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2017 as amended on 25 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF DRAMA MUSIC DANCE AND FILM AND TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED FACILITIES AT OAK HOUSE THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE FRIENDS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.