Financial history THE FRIENDS OF STOW SURGERY

Charity number: 1086648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.37k £6.13k £44.96k £10.52k £81.24k
Total expenditure £72.60k £16.87k £25.44k £16.60k £28.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A