Accounts and annual returns MULTI- ETHNIC MANCHESTER AT THE YEAR 2000 (MEM@2K)

Charity number: 1090100
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 17 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 15 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 02 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required