BUFFER (THE BREAST UNIT FUND FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF BREAST CANCER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 March 2001: Standard registration
- 07 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BUFFER (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.14k | £860 | £600 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £30.83k | £18.85k | £180 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 05 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 16 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 12 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
(1) THE SUPPORT OF THE DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF BREAST DISEASE, PARTICULARLY BREAST CANCER, AT THE BREAST CENTRE AT ST PETER'S HOSPITAL, CHERTSEY, SURREY AND AT SUCH OTHER CENTRES DEDICATED TO THE DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF BREAST DISEASE AS MAY COMMEND THEMSELVES TO THE TRUSTEES; (2) THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE QUALITY OF CARE AT SUCH CENTRES BY (WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT, THE EMPLOYMENT AND EDUCATION OF SPECIALIST STAFF AND THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS OF SUCH DISEASE; AND (3) CLINICAL RESEARCH (INCLUDING THE ANALYSIS OF CLINICAL DATA) AT SUCH CENTRES RELATING TO THE DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF BREAST DISEASE, PARTICULARLY BREAST CANCER.
Area of benefit
CHERTSEY, SURREY AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window