HOME START BUTETOWN GRANGETOWN RIVERSIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start BGR offers support, friendship and practical help to parents with young children in local communities. Our unique service recruits and trains volunteers-usually parents themselves-to provide informal,friendly and confidential support to families who have at least one child under five at home. We support parents as they grow in confidence and strength.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 20 March 2001: Standard registration
- 30 October 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1162161 HOME-START BUTETOWN GRANGETOWN RIVERSIDE LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.86k | £298.32k | £315.58k | £114.12k | £127.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.20k | £277.44k | £271.49k | £229.56k | £135.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 23 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 23 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 16 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 16 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 20 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/09/2000 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN. C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF CARDIFF.
Area of benefit
BUTETOWN, GRANGETOWN, RIVERSIDE IN CARDIFF.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window