Financial history THE ENTHUSIASM TRUST

Charity number: 1087438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 30/06/2024
Total gross income £544.25k £276.50k £239.79k £268.63k £60.36k
Total expenditure £472.14k £386.24k £307.62k £304.94k £281.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £22.56k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.18k £50.62k N/A £29.14k £52.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £23.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £505.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £3 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £15.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £472.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £23.90k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A