NOOR - E- ZAINEB TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity are in the field of promotion and furtherance of the religion of Islam in accordance with the Quran, the Sunna and the teaching of the Sunni Muslims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 14 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAJID JABBAR MANZOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED MANZOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARSHAD ZULFIQAR MANZOOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.05k | £36.10k | £20.99k | £33.02k | £42.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.37k | £16.29k | £17.52k | £6.39k | £17.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 April 2025 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 April 2025 | 709 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 April 2025 | 717 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2025 | 1074 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 FEBRUARY 2001 AND 7 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QUR'AN, THE SUNNA AND THE TEACHINGS OF THE SUNNI MUSLIMS, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MOSQUE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AS WELL AS TO EDUCATION GENERALLY, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL. (3) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY, BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE MUSLIM INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NOOR PLACE
NORBURY HALL
243 BARNSLEY ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S4 7AD
- Phone:
- 01142421100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window