Accounts and annual returns THE LONGFORD NEIGHBOURHOOD SERVICES CENTRE

Charity Number: 1088840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 March 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 December 2024 327 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 February 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 February 2023 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window