Financial history THE LONGFORD NEIGHBOURHOOD SERVICES CENTRE

Charity Number: 1088840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.37k £25.82k £25.95k £69.32k £59.00k
Total expenditure £26.43k £22.61k £22.70k £52.22k £60.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £750
Income from government grants £2.47k N/A N/A N/A £750