Trustees CAMBRIDGE ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS
Charity number: 1085377

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Curtis | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Goss | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Harwood | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Digby | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dunckley | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Leslie Maile | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Tremeer | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ryan | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Ryan | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.