DEPTFORD REACH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deptford Reach was a day centre that provides support, advice, training and practical help for vulnerable adults who are experiencing homelessness, mental illness, drug and alcohol abuse, social exclusion and severe poverty. The day centre continues to operate but was transferred to the Thames Reach Charity in November 2018
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 April 2001: Standard registration
- 16 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE DEPTFORD CHURCHES CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.50k | £230.81k | £285.36k | £207.60k | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £292.21k | £261.65k | £266.47k | £230.00k | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.93k | £32.99k | £0 | £29.45k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 19 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO REDUCE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST HOMELESS AND NEEDY PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN DEPTFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF A DROP IN CENTRE.
Area of benefit
DEPTFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window